+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-187
- Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2013
- Ratified
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Commerce
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/28/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Business and Labor
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Reptd Fav
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 7
June 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 28, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor