+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-77
- Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2018
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2018
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Finance Added
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Transportation
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 20
- 20-79.4
- 20-79.7
- 143B
- 143B-1325
- 20-37.6
- 20-63
- 20-81.12
- 2
+ − Votes (3)
June 15, 2018: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 18
June 15, 2018: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 13
April 10, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor