+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-238
- Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2013
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur In S Amend 1
- Rec From Senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2013: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
June 19, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 19, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 6, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor