+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Amendment Withdrawn A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Vote
April 26, 2017: A1 Clampitt Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1