+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor