+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 15A
- 15A-150
- 15A-1467
- 15A-1468
- 15A-981
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor