+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-24
- Signed by Gov. 6/2/2017
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/25/2017
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
- Reptd Fav
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Insurance
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 58
- 58-50-30
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor