+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment Ruled Out of Order A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2017: M8 Re-Refer Insurance Second Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 93
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor