+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Insurance
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health Care
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 130A
- 130A-221.5
- 58
- 58-2-70
- 131E
- 131E-13
- 131E-176
- 131E-184
- 58-56A-10
+ − Votes (4)
September 17, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 3
September 17, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2015: A1 Adcock Second Reading
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 9
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3