+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Finance
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 -
- 105-277.1C -
- 105-277.1E -
- 105-282.1 -
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2017: A1 Dollar Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
March 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor