+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/26/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/21/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 26, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor