+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2017-81
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government I
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
June 29, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6