+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor