+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor