+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-51
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2016
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2016
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Insurance
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/18/2015
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Appropriations
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 115B
- 115B-1
- 115B-2
- 115B-5
- 58-2-121
- 58-36-10
- 58-84-25
- 58-84-30
- 58-84-33
- 58-84-35
- 58-84-5
- 58
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
June 16, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
June 18, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor