+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2015-243
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Postponed To 04/01/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - Community Colleges
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 115D-12
- 115D
+ − Votes (4)
September 17, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 9
September 17, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
September 17, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 1, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor