+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Ordered Engrossed
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/01/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2015: A1 Glazier Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 1, 2015: A2 Stam Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor