+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor