+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-317
- Ratified
On July 22, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On July 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/22/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On July 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 6, 2013: A1 Jeter Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4