+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-196
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/30/2015
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/22/2015
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On July 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/20/2015
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Environment
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 143B
- 143B-30.1
+ − Votes (4)
July 28, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 14
July 20, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
July 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
April 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor