+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-19
- Signed by Gov. 6/24/2014
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/19/2014
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2014
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/19/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2014: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
June 11, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 19, 2013: A1 Moore, T. Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 19, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor