+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Insurance
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Failed A2
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/12/2015
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Finance
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (51)
- 56
- 58
- 120
- 159
- 120-123
- 120-19
- 120-19.1
- 120-19.4
- 120-3.1
- 159-81
- 159-83
- 159-89
- 159-90
- 159-93
- 159-95
- 159-96
- 56-36-30
- 58-10-700
- 58-10-705
- 58-10-710
- 58-10-715
- 58-10-720
- 58-36-10
- 58-36-20
- 58-36-30
- 58-36.20
- 58-45-47
- 58-45-5
- 58-45A-1
- 58-45A-10
- 58-45A-15
- 58-45A-20
- 58-45A-5
- 58-45A25
- 58-45A30
- 58-45A35
- 58-45A40
- 58-45A45
- 58-45A50
- 58-45A55
- 58-45A60
- 584547
- 58-36-15
- 58-45A-25
- 58-45A-30
- 58-45A-35
- 58-45A-40
- 58-45A-45
- 58-45A-50
- 58-45A-55
- 58-45A-60
+ − Votes (4)
May 13, 2015: A2 Luebke Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 80
- Absent: 5
May 13, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
May 12, 2015: A1 Millis Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
May 12, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor