+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amendment Withdrawn A1
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/26/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Business and Labor
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 26, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor