+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-128
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Pensions and Retirement
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
+ − Votes (3)
June 28, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2