+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Appropriations
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
April 10, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor