+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (59)
On July 18, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/18/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-99
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi
- Conferees Reappointed
- Conf Com Reported
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Conferees Reappointed
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferees Changed
- Conferees Changed
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Conf Com Dismissed
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Added to Calendar
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed On Cal For 05/31/2016
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Transportation
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Failed A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/21/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Transportation
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (71)
- 143
- 143-215.107A
- 106-850
- 106-860
- 113A-109
- 113A-112
- 113A-115.1
- 113A-67
- 115C-174.12
- 116-30.3B.
- 130A-290
- 130A-294
- 130A-309.06
- 130A-309.09A
- 130A-309.10
- 130A-309.140
- 130A-310.10
- 130A-310.40
- 139-60
- 143-135.39
- 143-135.40
- 143-138
- 143-214.7
- 143-215.1
- 143-215.104U
- 143-215.107C
- 143-215.3A
- 143-215.8B
- 143-215.9B
- 143-341
- 143-355
- 143-64.12
- 143B-135.48
- 143B-135.56
- 143B-279.17
- 143B-279.5
- 143B-279.7
- 143B-279.8
- 143B-282
- 150B-19
- 150B-19.3
- 150B-19.4
- 150B-21.3
- 150B-21.3A
- 150B-21.6
- 159G-72
- 18B-1105
- 18B-800
- 18B-804
- 45-91
- 74-54.1
- 87-98
- 18B
- 45
- 74
- 87
- 106
- 113A
- 115C
- 116
- 130A
- 139
- 143B
- 150B
- 159G
- 116-30.3B
- 159G-26
- 106-261
- 1
- 1-54
- 143-422.3
+ − Votes (7)
July 1, 2016: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 15
July 1, 2016: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 9
June 28, 2016: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
June 13, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 5
July 21, 2015: A1 Adams Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 10
July 21, 2015: M8 Re-Refer Environment Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
July 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10