+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-278
- Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2013
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA2
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur In S Amend 2
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/10/2013
- Rec From Senate
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in Senate Clerk's Office
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amendment Withdrawn 1
- Amend Recon A1
- Reconsidered 2nd Reading
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 07/03/2013
- Reconsidered 3rd Reading
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013
- Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in Senate Clerk's Office
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 97 -
+ − Votes (6)
July 10, 2013: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
July 3, 2013: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 9
July 3, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 9
July 2, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
July 2, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
May 14, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor