+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/23/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Health
- Reptd Fav
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Health
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105
- 105-269.8
+ − Vote
March 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor