+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 145
- 145-48
+ − Vote
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor