+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Redistricting
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Ways & Means
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Finance Stricken
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (31)
- 19A
- 105
- 153A
- 160A
- 105-164.13
- 105-164.13E
- 143A-6.
- 153A-442
- 160A-493
- 19A-21
- 19A-22
- 19A-23
- 19A-24
- 19A-25
- 19A-29.1
- 19A-29.2
- 19A-29.3
- 19A-29.4
- 19A-29.5
- 19A-29.6
- 19A-30
- 19A-32.1
- 19A-41
- 19A-61
- 19A-62
- 19A-64
- 19A-65
- 19A-66
- 90-101
- 14
- 14-362.4
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor