+ − Summaries (25)
+ − Full Texts (16)
+ − Actions (57)
On July 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/8/2022
- Ch. SL 2022-71
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Report Adopted
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Added to Calendar
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/01/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2022: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 12
July 1, 2022: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6