+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-127
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor