+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-52
- Signed by Gov. 5/17/2013
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/9/2013
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/07/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
April 30, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor