+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Failed 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 04/01/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/26/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/25/2015
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/24/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/23/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 32
- 90
- 32A-16
- 32A-25.1
- 90-321
- 32A
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2015: A1 Stam Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 1, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor