+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2015-33
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/24/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/23/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Local Government
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
March 24, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor