+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Postponed To 04/28/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Local Government
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Local Government
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 160A
- 160A-311.1
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2015: A1 Stam Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: A2 Millis Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor