+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
On July 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 14, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor