+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-205
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 08/30/2017
On August 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 08/29/2017
On August 24, 2017 in the House:
- Veto Overridden
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto received from House
- Placed On Cal For 08/25/2017
On August 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/24/2017
- Withdrawn From Com
On August 3, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed 07/27/2017
- Received from the Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Insurance
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2017: Motion 11 Veto Override
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 11
August 24, 2017: Veto Override
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 29, 2017: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
June 28, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor