+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/11/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-91
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2016
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 20
- 20-141
- 135-71
- 7A-45.3
- 7A-45.4
- 7A-52
- 7A-57
- 7A
- 135
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 109
- Absent: 11
June 29, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
April 30, 2015: A1 Torbett Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
April 30, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor