+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2019
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Education - Universities
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Education - Universities, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
June 26, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 3