+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 25, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-179
- Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/05/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/28/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/23/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/22/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 15A
- 15A-300.3
- 153A-217
+ − Votes (3)
June 28, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 6, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor