+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Added to Calendar
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amend Tabled A1
- Amend Tabled A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2021: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
June 1, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor