+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-30
- Signed by Gov. 6/8/2017
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/1/2017
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 14
- 14-27.21
- 4-27.21
- 14-27.26
+ − Votes (4)
May 30, 2017: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 8
May 25, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
May 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
March 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor