+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2020
- Ch. SL 2020-53
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/22/2020
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Ruled Not Material By Speaker
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Ruled Material
- Placed On Cal For 06/18/2020
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Engrossed
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2020: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 17, 2020: Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor