+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
June 18, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor