+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-88
- Signed by Gov. 7/30/2014
On July 24, 2014 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2014
On July 23, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/18/2014
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
+ − Votes (3)
July 22, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 1
July 21, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
June 18, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor