+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/30/2022
On June 20, 2022 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor