+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (59)
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 9/30/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-259
On September 25, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/25/2015
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On September 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Conf Report Adopted 3rd
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted 2nd
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted 3rd
On September 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted 2nd
On September 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 09/22/2015
- Conf Com Reported
- Ruled Material
On September 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Held As Material
- Placed On Cal For 09/21/2015
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On August 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conferees Changed
On August 20, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On August 19, 2015 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Ruled Material
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On August 12, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On August 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Finance Added
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Failed A1
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/04/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (29)
- 105 -
- 143B -
- 105-130.4 -
- 105-164.13 -
- 105-164.14A -
- 105-164.3 -
- 143B-437.02 -
- 143B-437.52 -
- 143B-437.53 -
- 143B-437.57 -
- 143B-437.62 -
- 143B-437.01 -
- 143B-437.56 -
- 105-164.27A -
- 105-164.4 -
- 105-164.44M -
- 105-164.4I -
- 105-467 -
- 105-469 -
- 105-472 -
- 105-486 -
- 105-487 -
- 105-501 -
- 105-502 -
- 105-522 -
- 105-523 -
- 143B-437.51 -
- 143B-437.55 -
- 143B-437.72 -
+ − Votes (13)
September 23, 2015: C RPT Adoption R3 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 13
September 22, 2015: C RPT Adoption R2 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 12
September 22, 2015: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
September 21, 2015: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
August 19, 2015: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
August 11, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
August 10, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
August 10, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
August 10, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2015: A1 Waddell Second Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2015: A2 Tine Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor