+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 25, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-85
- Ratified
On July 24, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
On July 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/24/2014
On July 22, 2014 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On July 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Com Amend Adopted A1
- Reptd Fav As Amended
On July 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2014
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (5)
July 24, 2014: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
July 21, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 2
July 17, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
June 30, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
June 26, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3