+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2020-20
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reconsidered Concurrence
- Conf Com Dismissed
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Fail Concur In S Amend SA1
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/10/2020
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/27/2020
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2020: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
June 9, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor